Global Patent Index - EP 1085175 A2

EP 1085175 A2 2001-03-21 - Valve with a non-linear response for a motor vehicle exhaust system

Title (en)

Valve with a non-linear response for a motor vehicle exhaust system

Title (de)

Ventil mit nicht-linearer Schaltcharakteristik, insbesondere für eine Kraftfahrzeug-Abgasanlage

Title (fr)

Soupape à réponse non lineaire pour le pot d'échappement d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 1085175 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116274 A

Priority

DE 19944671 A

Abstract (en)

The valve can be moved between a closed and a completely open position by a spring. The valve has a pot (4) with a casing (3) forming a sleeve with slots (7) formed as a valve body (8). The sleeve is guided in an annular fixed valve seat (2) between abutments. A slotted spring washer (13) has fingers (12) to engage the valve seat and is biased towards the closed position. In the closed position, a bypass opening (6) is provided towards the slots.

Abstract (de)

Ein Abgasventil mit Schaltcharakteristik enthält als Ventilkörper (8) einen Topf (4), dessen Mantel (3) als längsgeschlitzte Hülse ausgebildet und zum Eingriff von Fingern (12) einer geschlitzten Tellerfeder (13) eingerichtet ist. Bis zu einem vorgegebenen ersten Wert des Abgasdrucks hält die Feder (13) mit Vorspannung den Ventilkörper (8) in einer Stellung, in der seine Schlitze (7) strömungsmäßig unwirksam sind; bei höheren Druckwerten erfolgt dagegen eine weitgehende Öffnung des Ventils, und schließlich ergibt sich bis zur maximalen Ventilöffnung ein steiler Anstieg der Verstellkraft (K). Diese Charakteristik in Verbindung mit keilförmigen Längsschlitzen (7) im Ventilkörper (8) dient der Bekämpfung von Schwingungen im Abgassystem. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085175 A2 20010321; EP 1085175 A3 20030813; DE 19944671 A1 20010322

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040824

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040213

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 01N 1/16 A

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 16K 3/26 B

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI