Global Patent Index - EP 1085185 A2

EP 1085185 A2 2001-03-21 - Device and method for varying the compression ratio of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Device and method for varying the compression ratio of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Veränderung der Verdichtung einer Hubkolbenbrennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour varier le taux de compression d' un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1085185 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118203 A

Priority

DE 19944668 A

Abstract (en)

The device (1) has a sleeve (13) that fits in the big end (7) of a connecting rod (3). The sleeve has an opening (19) for the crankshaft and is rotatably fitted, in an eccentric position with respect to the big end. The sleeve or the connecting rod has at least one working chamber (45,47) acted on by an abutment (35) attached to a piston (53) operated with a pressurised medium to rotate the sleeve.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung zur Veränderung der Verdichtung einer Hubkolbenbrennkraftmaschine mit mindestens einem Pleuel, in dessen einer Kurbelwelle zuordenbaren Pleuelauge eine Hülse mit einer Kurbelwellen-Durchgriffsöffnung verdrehbar angeordnet ist, wobei die Kurbelwellen-Durchgriffsöffnung exzentrisch zum Pleuelauge angeordnet ist, vorgeschlagen. Die Vorrichtung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß die Hülse (13) oder das Pleuel (3) zur Verdrehung der Hülse (13) mindestens eine mit einem Druckmedium beaufschlagbare Arbeitskammer (45;47) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 75/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085185 A2 20010321; EP 1085185 A3 20020206; DE 19944668 A1 20010322

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040602

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLOFT, MANFRED, DIPL.-ING.

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI