Global Patent Index - EP 1085187 A2

EP 1085187 A2 2001-03-21 - Method and device for the increase of the torque in a direct injection internal-combustion engine with exhaust turbo-charger

Title (en)

Method and device for the increase of the torque in a direct injection internal-combustion engine with exhaust turbo-charger

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erhöhung des Drehmoments bei einer direkteinspritzenden Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Abgasturbolader

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour augmenter le couple d'un moteur à combustion interne à injection directe avec le turbocompresseur d'échappement

Publication

EP 1085187 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116976 A

Priority

DE 19944190 A

Abstract (en)

The torque output inprovement method has the primary fuel injection for one or more engine cylinders followed by a secondary fuel injection before starting off of the vehicle, indicated by monitoring one or more actions of the driver, e.g. the selection of the first gear, the release of the brake pedal, or the disconnection of the brake lights. An Independent claim for a device for increasing the torque output of a turbo-charged direct fuel injection i.c. engine is also included.

Abstract (de)

Eine Verbesserung des Ansprechverhaltens eines Fahrzeugs wird durch eine Drehmomentenerhöhung der Brennkraftmaschine erreicht, indem vor einem Anfahrvorgang neben einer Primäreinspritzung eine Nacheinspritzung in ein oder mehrere Zylinder der Brennkraftmaschine veranlaßt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 23/02; F02D 33/02; F02D 41/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 37/00 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F02D 23/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02D 41/40 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/405 (2013.01); F02D 41/0007 (2013.01); F02D 2250/22 (2013.01); Y02T 10/144 (2013.01); Y02T 10/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085187 A2 20010321; EP 1085187 A3 20030702; EP 1085187 B1 20060308; DE 19944190 A1 20010329; DE 50012338 D1 20060504; JP 2001107761 A 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012338

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090808

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061211

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012338 P 20060504

2006-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040102

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 23/02 A

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/40 B

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/00 B

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI