Global patent index - EP 1085198 A2

EP 1085198 A2 2001-03-21 - Actively controlled induction noise using a multipole inlet

Title (en)

Actively controlled induction noise using a multipole inlet

Title (de)

Aktiv gesteuerter Einlasslärm mit Multipole-Einlassvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Bruit d'admission contrôlé activement utilisant une admission multipôle

Publication

EP 1085198 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119166 A

Priority

US 15372299 P

Abstract (en)

An active noise attenuation assembly for an air induction system of an internal combustion engine is located in an air inlet duct leading to the engine. A fairing body is concentrically mounted within the duct and defines an annular space with the duct through which air travels. A loudspeaker is mounted on the fairing body facing outwardly from the duct. A controller generates an electrical signal amplified and phase shifted from a noise field emanating from the engine. The signal is applied to the loudspeaker for broadcasting a sound field phase shifted from the noise field for attenuating the noise field. A transition housing forms a first plurality of channels and a second plurality of channels. The housing mates to the outlet opening of the inlet duct. The first plurality of channels communicates with the loudspeaker and the second plurality of channels communicates with the annular space. The channels terminate at an end opposite the duct in a checkered pattern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/1227 (2013.01); F02M 35/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085198 A2 20010321; EP 1085198 A3 20011107; EP 1085198 B1 20021204; DE 60000904 D1 20030116; DE 60000904 T2 20030918

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-10-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60000904

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-16

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-12-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020121

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI