Global Patent Index - EP 1085199 A2

EP 1085199 A2 2001-03-21 - Actively controlled induction noise using a quadrapole inlet

Title (en)

Actively controlled induction noise using a quadrapole inlet

Title (de)

Aktiv gesteuertes Einlasslärm mir Quadripole-Einlassvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Bruit d'admission contrôlé activement utilisant une admission quadripôle

Publication

EP 1085199 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119167 A

Priority

US 15372199 P

Abstract (en)

An active noise attenuation assembly for an air induction system of an internal combustion engine is located in an air inlet duct leading to the engine. A fairing body is concentrically mounted within the duct and defines an annular space with the duct through which air travels. A loud speaker is mounted on the fairing body facing outwardly from the duct. A controller generates an electrical signal amplified and phase shifted from a noise field emanating from the engine. The signal is applied to the loudspeaker for broadcasting a sound field phase shifted from the noise field for attenuating the noise field. A transition housing having an outlet opening and an inlet opening forms a first pair of opposing channels and a second pair of opposing channels. The housing mates to the open end of the inlet duct. The first pair of opposing channels communicates with the speaker and the second pair of opposing channels communicates with the annular space. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/12 (2006.01); F02B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/125 (2013.01); F02B 27/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085199 A2 20010321; EP 1085199 A3 20011107; EP 1085199 B1 20030312; DE 60001610 D1 20030417; DE 60001610 T2 20031106

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040905

2004-11-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041118

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-09-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040905

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60001610 P 20030417

2003-04-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE INC.

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020110

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011010

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI