Global Patent Index - EP 1085204 A2

EP 1085204 A2 2001-03-21 - Engine ignition system

Title (en)

Engine ignition system

Title (de)

Motorzündsystem

Title (fr)

Système d'allumage d'un moteur

Publication

EP 1085204 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203176 A

Priority

  • JP 26080899 A
  • JP 2000106679 A

Abstract (en)

In an engine ignition system utilizing an AC generator (1) for supplying an electric power to an ignition coil (13), a phase relationship between the generator voltage and an ignition timing (T1) is determined so that an electric current flowing through a primary winding (L1) of the ignition coil (13) due to the voltage generation by the AC generator (1) at the ignition timing (T1) is greater than a predetermined current (Ad) required to produce a sufficient spark from a spark plug (14). Such an ignition system can advantageously ensure achieving ignition even when the battery is disconnected or totally discharged. Preferably, a capacitor (C1) is connected in parallel with the primary winding (L1) of the ignition coil (13). A stator core (6) for supporting a stator coil (5) in the AC generator (1) may be circumferentially displaceable to adjust the phase relationship between the ignition timing and the generator voltage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 1/00; F02P 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 1/00 (2006.01); F02P 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/0838 (2013.01); F02P 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085204 A2 20010321; EP 1085204 A3 20030212; EP 1085204 B1 20040421

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130913

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120917

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-06-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2003-12-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030516

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02P 1/00 A

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02P 3/08 B

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02P 1/08 B

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02P 7/067 B

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI