Global Patent Index - EP 1085210 A2

EP 1085210 A2 2001-03-21 - Pump with temperature sensor on the housing

Title (en)

Pump with temperature sensor on the housing

Title (de)

Pumpe mit Temperatursensor im Gehäuse

Title (fr)

Pompe avec capteur de température sur le carter

Publication

EP 1085210 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118047 A

Priority

  • DE 10038550 A
  • DE 19943581 A

Abstract (en)

The pump (1) has an integrated temperature sensor (3) for detecting the temperature of the engine coolant passing through the pump chamber (4), fitted into a recess (10) in the wall of the pump housing (9), which has a reduced wall thickness in the vicinity of the temperature sensor. The signals from the temperature sensor control the revs of the electric drive motor for the pump, for regulating the pumped flowrate.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer insbesondere für einen Kühlmittelkreislauf eines Verbrennungsmotors eines Kraftfahrzeugs bestimmten Pumpe (1) ist ein in die Pumpe integrierter Temperatursensor (3) zur Erfassung der Temperatur der in eine Pumpenkammer (4) einströmenden Flüssigkeit vorgesehen. Der Temperatursensor (3) ist hierzu in eine Ausnehmung (10) eines Pumpengehäuses (9) der Pumpe (1) eingesetzt, welche im Bereich (11) des Temperatursensors (3) zu einer reduzierten Wandstärke (d) führt. Hierdurch kann der Wärmedurchgang durch das Pumpengehäuse (9) von der Flüssigkeit auf den Temperatursensor (3) verbessert und der Herstellungsaufwand reduziert werden. Weiterhin kann der Temperatursensor (3) hierbei auf einem mit einer Steuerung (15) der Pumpe (16) gemeinsamen Trägermaterial (14) angeordnet werden, wodurch die Störanfälligkeit der Kontaktierung des Temperatursensors (3) reduziert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 53/16; F04D 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/00 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01); F04D 29/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 53/16 (2013.01); F04B 2201/0801 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085210 A2 20010321; EP 1085210 A3 20040331; JP 2001107895 A 20010417; US 6527517 B1 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04B 53/16 A

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 15/02 B

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI