Global Patent Index - EP 1085211 A2

EP 1085211 A2 2001-03-21 - Discharge valve for a compressor

Title (en)

Discharge valve for a compressor

Title (de)

Auslassventil für Verdichter

Title (fr)

Soupape de refoulement pour compresseurs

Publication

EP 1085211 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119768 A

Priority

JP 26570699 A

Abstract (en)

An opening and closing device for a compressor gas passage, such as a compressor discharge passage, includes a valve body which moves between an opened position in which gas flows through the passage and a closed position in which gas flow is stopped. In a scroll type compressor, a discharge port of the compressor, which leads to the discharge passage, has an accommodation chamber formed therearound in the base plate of the movable scroll. The valve body is floatably and movably accommodated in the accommodation chamber, to move in the direction of gas flow. The valve body has guide pieces which protrude in the direction of valve movement from respective equally spaced locations along the circumference of the valve body. The valve body moves between a valve-closed position in which it closes the discharge port, contacting the bottom surface of the discharge port and the accommodation chamber and a valve-opened position in which it opens the discharge port, contacting a circular clip which limits its movement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 29/08; F04C 18/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/10 (2006.01); F04C 18/02 (2006.01); F04C 29/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 29/126 (2013.01); F04C 18/0215 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085211 A2 20010321; EP 1085211 A3 20020130; JP 2001082338 A 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021224

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI