Global patent index - EP 1085217 A3

EP 1085217 A3 2001-04-18 - Pump housing with integrated electronics

Title (en)

Pump housing with integrated electronics

Title (de)

Pumpengehäuse mit intergrierter Elektronik

Title (fr)

Carter de pompe avec électronique intégrée

Publication

EP 1085217 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00113847 A

Priority

DE 19943577 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1085217A2] The wet-running pump is driven by a speed-regulated electric motor and has an electronic module (7) containing control electronics and a pump housing (4) enclosing a spiral chamber (6) with a central suction port and a pressure port. The pump housing has a mounting (8) on which the electronic module is brought into thermal contact with the pump medium in the spiral chamber. An Independent claim is also included for the use of a rotary pump for circulating the coolant in a motor vehicle cooling circuit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/58; F04D 13/06; H02K 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/06 (2006.01); F04D 15/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/58 (2006.01); F01P 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/06 (2013.01); F04D 13/0686 (2013.01); F04D 29/5813 (2013.01); F01P 5/10 (2013.01); F01P 2050/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19943577 A1 20010315; EP 1085217 A2 20010321; EP 1085217 A3 20010418

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI