Global Patent Index - EP 1085218 A2

EP 1085218 A2 2001-03-21 - Rodless fluid pressure cylinder

Title (en)

Rodless fluid pressure cylinder

Title (de)

Kolbenstangenloser Druckmittelzylinder

Title (fr)

Vérin sans tige

Publication

EP 1085218 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119717 A

Priority

DE 19945067 A

Abstract (en)

The cylinder has a cylinder tube (11) with slots (15) and closed at one end. A sealed piston moves in the cylinder and supports a force transfer element that protrudes from the slots. A flexible sealing band (17) inside the cylinder seals the slots and is held by a holder unit (19) on both sides of the piston at the sealing surface of the cylinder inner wall. The sealing band has a pair of sealing lips (37) at the sealing surface. Support surfaces (34) with support grooves are formed at the sealing face of the cylinder tube. The holder unit is formed with paired nose-shaped holder ribs (32) formed at the sealing band and holder grooves (23) arranged in the slot area. The sealing band is formed so that when the cylinder interior is pressure-free, the holder ribs engage the sealing band in the holder grooves and the sealing lips at the cylinder inner wall. The support surfaces of the sealing band are spaced from the support surfaces (27) in the cylinder tube.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein kolbenstangenloser Druckmittelzylinder (10) vorgeschlagen, bei dem das den Innenraum (13) abdichtende, innere Dichtband (17) durch eine formschlüssig arbeitende Halteeinrichtung (19) so im Längsschlitz (15) gehalten wird, daß neben einer stabilen Halterung des Dichtbandes (17) eine sichere Abdichtung auch bei drucklosem Druckmittelzylinder (10) gegeben ist. Paarweise am Dichtband (17) auskragende Halterippen (32) ragen in gehäuseseitige Haltenuten (23) im Längsschlitz (15), wodurch paarweise angeordnete Dichtlippen (37) dichtend an der Zylinderinnenwand (31) gehalten werden, während die beiden Auflageflächen (34) des Dichtbandes (17) noch im Abstand von gegenüberliegenden Stützflächen (27) im Zylinderrohr (11) liegen und erst bei druckbeaufschlagtem Druckmittelzylinder (10) zur Anlage kommen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/082 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3807786 A1 19880922 - CKD CORP [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085218 A2 20010321; EP 1085218 A3 20030917; DE 19945067 A1 20010322

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-07-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI