Global Patent Index - EP 1085258 A2

EP 1085258 A2 2001-03-21 - A lamp

Title (en)

A lamp

Title (de)

Eine Lampe

Title (fr)

Une lampe

Publication

EP 1085258 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307940 A

Priority

GB 9922095 A

Abstract (en)

A lamp comprising an electric light bulb (8) mounted on a body (2) comprising two rigid support members (18,20) which are electrically conductive and electrically insulated from each other. The light bulb (8) comprises two electrical terminals (34,36) mounted in contact with the respective support members (18,20). The lamp also comprises means (10,12) for connecting an electric power supply to the conductive support members (18,20). The main body (2), therefore, provides the entire electrically conductive path between the power supply and the light bulb (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 23/00; H01R 33/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2006.01); H01R 33/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/06 (2013.01); F21V 19/0005 (2013.01); F21V 19/0055 (2013.01); F21V 23/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085258 A2 20010321; EP 1085258 A3 20030702; GB 2355061 A 20010411; GB 9922095 D0 19991117

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051005

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI