Global Patent Index - EP 1085269 A2

EP 1085269 A2 2001-03-21 - Arrangement for the adjustment of a heater to the actual heat requirement

Title (en)

Arrangement for the adjustment of a heater to the actual heat requirement

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Anpassung eines Heizgerätes an den tatsächlichen Wärmebedarf

Title (fr)

Agencement pour le réglage d'un réchauffeur au besoin réel de la chaleur

Publication

EP 1085269 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119953 A

Priority

  • DE 19944195 A
  • DE 10044734 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a control device to determine the flow temperature of the heating and can boost the flow temperature for rapid heating in a stationary operation. The desired value of the flow temperature after a night-time cooling or known heat usage is determined for a given or adjustable time and the flow temperature is raised in the stationary operation by a given or adjustable amount. The length of the rapid heating first begins at a determined time corresponding to the rapid heating, if the actual flow temperature is higher than that for the stationary operation.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung sieht eine Anordnung zur Anpassung der Leistung eines Heizgerätes an den tatsächlichen Wärmebedarf, insbesondere eines Gebäudes, vor. Innerhalb mehrerer Räume ist eine Einzelraumregelung über Heizkörperthermostatventile vorgesehen. Die Vorlauftemperatur der Heizung wird über eine Steuerung bzw. eine Regelung bestimmt und ist für eine Schnellaufheizung über die Vorlauftemperatur im stationären Betrieb anhebbar. Erfindungsgemäß wird der Sollwert der Vorlauftemperatur nach der Nachtabsenkung oder bei erkanntem Wärmebedarf für eine bestimmte, gegebenenfalls einstellbare Zeit und einen bestimmten, gegebenenfalls einstellbaren Betrag derart angehoben, wobei die Dauer der Schnellaufheizung entsprechend der bestimmten Zeit erst dann zu laufen beginnt, wenn die tatsächlich erreichte Vorlauftemperatur höher ist als die Vorlauftemperatur im stationären Betrieb. Über den Gradienten der mittleren Vorlauftemperatur kann erkannt werden, dass Heizkörperthermostatventile in den Räumen beginnen herunter zu regeln, um die Anhebung des Sollwerts der Vorlauftemperatur zu beenden. Die Anlage kann auf diese Weise im stationären Betrieb mit niedrigerer Vorlauftemperatur gefahren werden, ohne dass dadurch der Komfort insgesamt gemindert wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/1009 (2013.01); F24D 19/1015 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085269 A2 20010321; EP 1085269 A3 20030129

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20091028

2007-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070618

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NOTHDURFT, GERHARD

2001-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SIHLER, HANS-ULRICH

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI