Global Patent Index - EP 1085274 A2

EP 1085274 A2 2001-03-21 - Device introducing air in a room

Title (en)

Device introducing air in a room

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Einbringen von Luft in einen Raum

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour introduire de l'air dans un local

Publication

EP 1085274 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118718 A

Priority

  • DE 19944458 A
  • DE 19951401 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a connection (1) for an air conduction system, an outlet box (4) and an outlet. The outlet box comprises a curved shell part (6), which forms two sides and a cover of the outlet. Two opposite end faces (2,5) are inserted into the curved shell part. The connection to the air conduction system is preferably inserted in an opening in an end face or a side of the shell part.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zum Einbringen von Luft in einen Raum mit einem Anschluss (1, 1.1) an ein Luftführungssystem, einem Auslasskasten (4, 4.1) und einen Auslass (18) soll der Auslasskasten (4, 4.1) aus einem gekrümmten Schalenbogen (6. 6.1) bestehen, welcher zwei Seiten (7, 8 bzw. 7.1, 8.1) und eine Decke (9) des Auslasses (18) bildet, wobei sich gegenüberliegend zwei Stirnflächen (2, 5) in den Schalenbogen (6, 6.1) eingesetzt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 3/16 (2006.01); F24F 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/06 (2013.01); F24F 3/1603 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085274 A2 20010321; EP 1085274 A3 20020612

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050407

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHAKO KLIMA LUFT FERDINAND SCHAD KG

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24F 13/06 A, 7F 24F 13/072 B

2002-06-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR INTRODUCING AIR IN A ROOM

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI