Global Patent Index - EP 1085286 A1

EP 1085286 A1 2001-03-21 - PLATE TYPE HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (en)

PLATE TYPE HEAT EXCHANGER

Title (de)

PLATTENWÄRMETAUSCHER

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE DU TYPE A PLAQUES

Publication

EP 1085286 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00911295 A

Priority

  • JP 0001762 W
  • JP 7985999 A
  • JP 7986099 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a plate heat exchanger for exchanging heat between two fluids flowing alternately through adjacent fluid passages between piled plates. Two plates are piled as a set on each other at peripheries thereof to form a heat exchange element (2). Each of the two plates has a projection and a depression and is provided with opening portions (5) at both ends in a longitudinal direction thereof. A plurality of the heat exchange elements (2) are piled so that the opening portions (5) are aligned with each other. A space (11) between the two plates (3) forming the heat exchange element (2) defines a passage for a first fluid. A space (12) between the adjacent heat exchange elements (2) defines a passage for another fluid having heat exchange relationship with the first fluid. The plate (3) serves as a heat transfer surface for both of the fluids. The peripheral portions (4) of the heat exchange elements (2) are brought into contact with each other to form a sealed passage for the second fluid when the heat exchange elements (2) are piled on each other. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 3/04 (2006.01); F25B 37/00 (2006.01); F25B 39/02 (2006.01); F25B 39/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/046 (2013.01); F28D 9/0043 (2013.01); F28D 9/0093 (2013.01); F25B 37/00 (2013.01); F25B 39/026 (2013.01); F25B 39/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085286 A1 20010321; EP 1085286 A4 20040616; CN 1190644 C 20050223; CN 1297523 A 20010530; WO 0057121 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20051222

2004-06-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2004-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 28D 9/00 A

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE