Global Patent Index - EP 1085288 A1

EP 1085288 A1 2001-03-21 - Apparatus for controlling a circulation system for heat transfer fluid

Title (en)

Apparatus for controlling a circulation system for heat transfer fluid

Title (de)

Steuervorrichtung für Kreislaufanlage für Warmeträgerflüssigkeit

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande d'un système de circulation de fluide caloporteur

Publication

EP 1085288 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00460050 A

Priority

FR 9911709 A

Abstract (en)

The control system has a number of channels, each one associated with a temperature controlled zone (P1-P4) by thermostats (2a-2d) allowing a guide temperature for the respective zones. The thermostatic controls are programmable to register a number of guide temperatures, each one associated with a specific regulating level. There is a master controller (16) allowing a first mode in which the regulating level for each temperature controlled zone is determined by the respective thermostatic control units, and a second mode in which the level of regulation for each temperature controlled zone is determined by the master control unit.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif de commande d'un système de circulation de fluide caloporteur (10, 12, 14) comportant une pluralité de voies (8a-8d), chacune étant associée à une zone contrôlée en température (P1-P4) par des moyens de commande thermostatiques (2a-2d) permettant d'établir une température de consigne pour leurs zones respectives, les moyens de commande thermostatiques (2a-2d) étant programmables pour enregistrer une pluralité de températures de consigne, chacune étant associée à un niveau de réglage spécifique. Il est caractérisé en ce qu'il comporte en outre des moyens de commande maître (16) permettant un premier mode dans lequel le niveau de réglage pour chaque zone contrôlée en température (P1-P4) est déterminé par les moyens de commande thermostatique respectifs (2a-2d) et un second mode dans lequel le niveau de réglage pour chaque zone contrôlée en température est déterminé par lesdits moyens de commande maître. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 27/00; F24D 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/10 (2006.01); F24F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/1015 (2013.01); F24F 11/006 (2013.01); F24F 2011/0067 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085288 A1 20010321; EP 1085288 B1 20051012; DE 60023079 D1 20060223; DE 60023079 T2 20060608; ES 2250091 T3 20060416; FR 2798458 A1 20010316; FR 2798458 B1 20011214

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2250091

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60023079

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-02-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2005-10-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051012

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030724

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI