Global Patent Index - EP 1085391 A1

EP 1085391 A1 2001-03-21 - System of decoupling a decoupling current from a load current and adapted to obtain a controlled variable to control the load curent

Title (en)

System of decoupling a decoupling current from a load current and adapted to obtain a controlled variable to control the load curent

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Auskopplung eines Auskoppelstroms aus einem Laststrom und zur Gewinnung einer Regelgrösse zur Steuerung des Laststroms

Title (fr)

Système de découplage d'un courant decouplé provenant d'un courant sous charge et utilisé pour recevoir une variable commandée afin de commander le courant sous charge

Publication

EP 1085391 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00203159 A

Priority

DE 19944397 A

Abstract (en)

The device provides a tap--off current from the current through a load, e.g. a television tube deflection coil, or a motor winding, used for regulation of the load current, via a tap-off resistance (4) and a tap-off current reflector (9,10,11), with the tap-off current obtained from the emitters of 2 output transistors (10,11) of the tap-off current reflector. The tap-off current is combined with a reference current provided by a reference current bank (12), the collector currents of the output transistors fed to 2 current reflectors (23,27), a further current reflector (28) receiving a reference current from the reference current bank. The regulation value is obtained from the difference between the voltage drops across a pair of resistors (35,36) associated with the current reflectors.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Anordnung zur Auskopplung eines Auskoppelstromes aus einem Laststrom durch einen Verbraucher (2), insbesondere eine Ablenkspule einer Braunschen Röhre, mittels eines Auskoppelwiderstands (4), wobei die Anordnung einen Auskoppelstromspiegel (9,10,11) aufweist, wobei eine Regelgröße in Form der Differenz zweier über zwei Widerständen (35,36) abfallenden Spannungen zur Steuerung des Laststroms generiert wird und wobei eine Referenzstrombank (12) mit einer Stromspiegelschaltung, der eingangsseitig ein Konstantstrom zugeführt wird, zur Generierung konstanter Ströme vorgesehen ist, ist für eine möglichst geringe Temperaturabhängigkeit vorgesehen, dass der Auskoppelstrom auf die Emitter wenigstens eines ersten (10) und wenigstens eines zweiten (11) Ausgangstransistors des Auskoppelstromspiegels gekoppelt wird, dass die Referenzstrombank (12) einen ersten Referenzstrom liefert, der zusammen mit dem Auskoppelstrom auf die Emitter des ersten (10) und des zweiten (11) Ausgangstransistors des Auskoppelstromspiegels gekoppelt wird, dass der Strom durch den Kollektor des ersten Ausgangstransistors (10) des Auskoppelstromspiegels auf den Eingang eines ersten Stromspiegels (23) gekoppelt wird, dass der Ausgangsstrom des ersten Stromspiegels (23) auf den Kollektor eines Eingangstransistors (9) des Auskoppelstromspiegels gekoppelt wird, dass ein zweiter Stromspiegel (27) vorgesehen ist, auf dessen Eingang der Strom durch den Kollektor des zweiten Ausgangstransistor (11) des Auskoppelstromspiegels gekoppelt wird und dessen Ausgangsstrom auf einen ersten Widerstand (35) gekoppelt wird, dass ein dritter Stromspiegel (28) vorgesehen ist, auf dessen Eingang ein zweiter Referenzstrom aus der Referenzstrombank (12) gekoppelt wird, dessen Ausgangsstrom auf einen zweiten Widerstand (36) gekoppelt wird, dass der erste Referenzstrom das n-fache des zweiten Referenzstroms beträgt, worin n die Zahl der Ausgangstransistoren (19,11) des Auskoppelstromspiegels ist, und dass die Differenz der über dem ersten (35) und dem zweiten (36) Widerstand abfallenden Spannungen die Regelgröße darstellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 3/16 (2006.01); G05F 1/10 (2006.01); G05F 3/26 (2006.01); G05F 3/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/265 (2013.01); G05F 3/222 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[AD] "TDA4866 Full bridge current driven vertical deflection booster", 14 June 1999, PHILIPS SEMICONDUCTORS, EINDHOVEN, NL, XP002156992

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085391 A1 20010321; EP 1085391 B1 20021218; DE 19944397 A1 20010322; JP 2001159919 A 20010612; JP 4560190 B2 20101013; US 6366036 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140912

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50000958

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140912

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50000958

2013-12-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ENTROPIC COMMUNICATIONS, INC., US

- Effective date: 20131119

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ENTROPIC COMMUNICATIONS, INC., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS (FAR EAST) LTD., GRAND CAYMAN, KY

- Document: DE 50000958

- Effective date: 20121023

2012-12-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ENTROPIC COMMUNICATIONS, INC., SAN DIEGO, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS (FAR EAST) LTD., GRAND CAYMAN, KY

- Document: DE 50000958

- Effective date: 20121023

2012-12-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000958

- Representative's name: EPPING HERMANN FISCHER, PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20121023

2012-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000958

- Representative's name: EPPING HERMANN FISCHER, PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCH, DE

2012-05-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS (FAR EAST) LTD., KY

- Effective date: 20120418

2012-03-08 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50000958

- Effective date: 20110426

2007-04-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-01-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-01-02 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2003-04-16 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20030321

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000958 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000958 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011203

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI