Global patent index - EP 1085439 A1

EP 1085439 A1 2001-03-21 - Auction method and apparatus for electronic commerce

Title (en)

Auction method and apparatus for electronic commerce

Title (de)

Auktionsverfahren und Anordnung für elektronischen Handel

Title (fr)

Procédé de vente aux enchéres et appareil pour le commerce éléctronique

Publication

EP 1085439 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00307531 A

Priority

  • EP 00307531 A
  • EP 99307307 A
  • GB 0011986 A

Abstract (en)

An electronic trading entity (400) comprises a computing device having a processor, memory, user interface, and communications functionality, the computer entity comprising an algorithm (700) for monitoring a plurality of auction entities remotely over the internet; a algorithm (701) for calculating bids and for purchase of goods/services with a plurality of auction entities; an algorithm (702) for selecting individual auction entities with which to trade; a web browser (506) to allow a user to search for auction entities and add these to a stored list of entities at the bidding device. Bid calculation and offer calculation algorithms operate to optimally place bids at a lowest overall cost to the trading entity, or place offers with the object of obtaining the highest overall monetary figures for goods or services for sale by the trading entity. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5715402 A 19980203 - POPOLO CARL A [US]
  • [A] WO 9834187 A1 19980806 - AUTOCOM APS [DK], et al
  • [X] WURMAN P R ET AL.: "The Michigan Internet AuctionBot: a configurable auction server for human and software agents", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2ND INT. CONF. ON AUTONOMOUS AGENTS, 9 May 1998 (1998-05-09) - 13 May 1998 (1998-05-13), pages 301 - 308, XP002131462
  • [X] MAES P ET AL: "Agents That Buy and Sell", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ACM, vol. 42, no. 3, March 1999 (1999-03-01), pages 81 - 91, XP002131463
  • [A] TSVETOVATYY M ET AL: "MAGMA: an agent-based virtual market for electronic commerce", APPLIED ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, 22 April 1996 (1996-04-22) - 24 April 1996 (1996-04-24), XP002079276

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085439 A1 20010321

INPADOC legal status

2007-08-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070227

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061016

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI