Global Patent Index - EP 1085491 A1

EP 1085491 A1 2001-03-21 - Bus stop pole

Title (en)

Bus stop pole

Title (de)

Haltestellenpfhal

Title (fr)

Poteau d'arrêt de bus

Publication

EP 1085491 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00200418 A

Priority

HK 99104072 A

Abstract (en)

A bus stop pole has at a convenient height a housing having two display surfaces. One is intended to carry advertising material, while the other uses panels of LEDs and a touch-screen, liquid-crystal display to display variable information in response to manipulation of the touch-screen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/04 (2006.01); E01F 9/011 (2006.01); E04H 12/00 (2006.01); G08G 1/127 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01); G09F 9/33 (2006.01); G09F 9/35 (2006.01); G09F 15/00 (2006.01); G09F 19/22 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

G09F (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 1/00 (2013.01); E01F 9/623 (2016.02); E04H 12/00 (2013.01); G08G 1/127 (2013.01); G09F 9/00 (2013.01); G09F 9/33 (2013.01); G09F 9/35 (2013.01); G09F 13/04 (2013.01); G09F 15/00 (2013.01); G09F 19/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085491 A1 20010321; AU 1945000 A 20010322; AU 736184 B2 20010726; CA 2298909 A1 20010320; HK 1020154 A2 20000225; JP 2001101589 A 20010413; KR 20010029572 A 20010406

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-05-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: GB

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): GB

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI