Global Patent Index - EP 1085492 A2

EP 1085492 A2 2001-03-21 - Digital information system

Title (en)

Digital information system

Title (de)

Digitales Informationssystem

Title (fr)

Système d'information numérique

Publication

EP 1085492 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123044 A

Priority

  • EP 97921051 A
  • SE 9601603 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a digital information system (10) for displaying information on at least one display means with the aid of at least one projector or electronic display (22). The exposures are presented at places accessible to and frequented by a general public. The information system (10) includes external information mediators (24) and information is controlled dynamically through the medium of a communication interface (26) and through the medium of an exposure handler in a central computer (28). The inventive system also includes a communication interface (14) against an elective number of station computers (34) having connected projector computers (38) which control projectors or electronic displays (22) for displaying pictures or exposures. The station computers (34) and peripheral equipment are situated at mutually distanced places. According to one particular field of use, the places mentioned are subway stations (16, 18, 20) and projectors or electronic displays (22) project exposures or pictures onto display means positioned at selected places in the stations (16, 18, 20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 19/18; G06F 17/60; G09F 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/00 (2011.01); G09F 15/00 (2006.01); G09F 19/18 (2006.01); G09F 27/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

G06F (2006.01); G09F (2006.01); H04N (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/005 (2013.01); G09F 19/18 (2013.01); G09F 27/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085492 A2 20010321; EP 1085492 A3 20020807; SE 507473 C2 19980608; SE 9601603 D0 19960426; SE 9601603 L 19971027; ZA 9703650 B 19971119

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1037263

2005-04-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050225

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041027

2003-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20001024

- Countries: AL

2003-05-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20001024

- Countries: LT

2003-05-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20001024

- Countries: LV

2003-05-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20001024

- Countries: RO

2003-05-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20001024

- Countries: SI

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFOSCREEN GESELLSCHAFT FUER STADTINFORMATIONSANLA

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001024;LT PAYMENT 20001024;LV PAYMENT 20001024;RO PAYMENT 20001024;SI PAYMENT 20001024

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001024

2001-03-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 898772

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001024;LT PAYMENT 20001024;LV PAYMENT 20001024;RO PAYMENT 20001024;SI PAYMENT 20001024