Global Patent Index - EP 1085535 A1

EP 1085535 A1 2001-03-21 - Planar transformer

Title (en)

Planar transformer

Title (de)

Planartransformator

Title (fr)

Transformateur planaire

Publication

EP 1085535 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116058 A

Priority

DE 19945013 A

Abstract (en)

The transformer has a multi-layer structure (7), provided by flat electrical winding layers and intermediate insulation layers, mounted on a carrier (1) and enclosing a magnetic core (6). The carrier incorporates heavy current windings, e.g. Cu stampings and their associated current terminals (5) and is formed as a rectangular frame with a central opening (4) for reception of the magnetic core.

Abstract (de)

Ein Planartransformator mit Hochstromwindungen, einem Mehrschichtaufbau (7), dessen Schichten von flachen elektrisch leitenden Windungen und dazwischen angeordneten Isolierungen gebildet werden, einem von den Windungen umgebenen Magnetkern und einen Träger (1) für den Mehrschichtaufbau, wobei die Hochstromwindungen jeweils voneinander isoliert in den Träger (1) mit herausgeführten elektrischen Stromanschlüssen (5) integriert sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/28; H01F 27/02; H01F 27/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/02 (2006.01); H01F 27/28 (2006.01); H01F 27/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/2852 (2013.01); H01F 27/027 (2013.01); H01F 27/292 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085535 A1 20010321; EP 1085535 B1 20090909; AT 442655 T 20090915; DE 19945013 C1 20010405; DE 19945013 C5 20051013; DE 50015737 D1 20091022

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120726

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120727

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120726

2013-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 442655

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120726

2013-03-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110705

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50015737

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2010-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100610

2009-12-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2009-10-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50015737

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-10-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-09-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2007-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061229

2003-08-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EPCOS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI