Global Patent Index - EP 1085536 B1

EP 1085536 B1 2002-11-27 - Transformer

Title (en)

Transformer

Title (de)

Transformator

Title (fr)

Transformateur

Publication

EP 1085536 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116925 A

Priority

DE 19943576 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1085536A1] The transformer has a ferrite core (3) with at least one primary winding and at least one secondary winding. The core is positioned between 2 substrate plates (1,2), provided with conductor paths (5), coupled to conductor plates (4) enclosing the transformer core, for providing the transformer windings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/06 (2006.01); H01F 27/08 (2006.01); H01F 27/22 (2006.01); H01F 27/28 (2006.01); H01F 27/30 (2006.01); H01F 30/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/2804 (2013.01); H01F 27/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085536 A1 20010321; EP 1085536 B1 20021127; DE 19943576 C1 20010517; JP 2001110646 A 20010420

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-08-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000813 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI