Global Patent Index - EP 1085537 A3

EP 1085537 A3 2001-04-11 - Planar transformer, manufacturing process of its winding and compact electrical device comprising such a planar transformer

Title (en)

Planar transformer, manufacturing process of its winding and compact electrical device comprising such a planar transformer

Title (de)

Planartransformator und Verfahren zur Herstellung seiner Wicklung sowie eine kompakte elektrische Vorrichtung mit einem solchen Planartransformator

Title (fr)

Transformateur planaire, procédé de fabrication de son enroulement et appareil électrique compacte comportant un tel transformateur planaire

Publication

EP 1085537 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00119213 A

Priority

  • DE 19944072 A
  • DE 10039890 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1085537A2] Planar transformers with compact electronics arranged in shock-proof mounting and particularly suitable for use in motor vehicles, have the primary and secondary windings (3a,3b) each designed as a folded electrical conductor (15) having a non-round cross-section. These electrical conductors (15) are formed from a metal strip or band, or as a sheet-metal part and at least one insulation layer is arranged parallel to the electrical conductor (15) and can be folded with the electrical conductor (15) in one working step.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/28; H01F 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/28 (2006.01); H01F 27/32 (2006.01); H01F 30/00 (2006.01); H01F 41/04 (2006.01); H01F 41/06 (2006.01); H01F 41/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/2847 (2013.01); H01F 27/2804 (2013.01); H01F 41/063 (2016.01); H01F 2027/2861 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085537 A2 20010321; EP 1085537 A3 20010411; JP 2001126933 A 20010511

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010306

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI