Global Patent Index - EP 1085548 A2

EP 1085548 A2 2001-03-21 - Method and device for controlling a consumer

Title (en)

Method and device for controlling a consumer

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Verbrauchers

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif de commande d'un consommateur

Publication

EP 1085548 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110329 A

Priority

DE 19944831 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves providing a first signal (H1-H4) which determines the duration of a first control phase, in which a clocked control is performed. A drive signal (S1-S4) for the control of the load is provided outgoing from a logical combination of the first signal and a Pulse-Width-Modulated signal (PWM).

Abstract (de)

Es werden ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Verbrauchers beschrieben. Ein erstes Signal (H) bestimmt die Dauer einer ersten Ansteuerphase. Wenigstens in der ersten Ansteuerphase erfolgt eine getaktete Ansteuerung. Ein Ansteuersignal (S) zur Steuerung eines Verbrauchers ist ausgehend von einer logischen Verknüpfung des ersten Signals (H) und einem PWM-Signal (PWM) vorgebbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 47/32; H01F 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/32 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01); H01H 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/325 (2013.01); H01F 7/1877 (2013.01); H01H 47/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085548 A2 20010321; EP 1085548 A3 20020102; DE 19944831 A1 20010322

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-10-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 47/32 A

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI