Global Patent Index - EP 1085549 A2

EP 1085549 A2 2001-03-21 - Bistable contactor

Title (en)

Bistable contactor

Title (de)

Bistabiles Schütz

Title (fr)

Contacteur bistable

Publication

EP 1085549 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120024 A

Priority

DE 29916233 U

Abstract (en)

The breaker comprises a circuit breaker coil (7,8) with an associated movable armature (23) with contacts (22) for shifting from a first position to a second position. The armature is supported in one of its stable positions by a permanent magnet (17). The permanent magnet is fixed with respect to the coil, while a spring element (28) pre-stresses the armature away from the permanent magnet, in the outer stable position. In the stable position, formed by the permanent magnet, the circuit is made.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein bistabiles Schütz mit wenigstens einer Spule (7,8) und einem gegenüber der Spule beweglichen Anker (23) mit Kontakten (22), der zusammen mit den Kontakten zum Öffnen oder Schließen eines Stromkreises mittels der Spule von einer ersten stabilen Stellung in eine zweite stabile Stellung überführbar ist, und einem Dauermagneten (17), über den sich der Anker in einer seiner stabilen Stellungen gegenüber der Spule abstützt, wobei der Dauermagnet gegenüber der Spule ortsfest ist und ein Federelement (28) vorgesehen ist, das den Anker in die andere stabile Stellung vom Dauermagneten beabstandend vorspannt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/2209 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29916233 U1 20010125; EP 1085549 A2 20010321; EP 1085549 A3 20021016; EP 1085549 B1 20050511; US 6538541 B1 20030325

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060214

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050922

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010274 P 20050616

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI