Global Patent Index - EP 1085551 A2

EP 1085551 A2 2001-03-21 - Latching device for a switch

Title (en)

Latching device for a switch

Title (de)

Verklinkungseinrichtung für einen elektrischen Schalter

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'encliquetage pour un interrupteur

Publication

EP 1085551 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119982 A

Priority

DE 19944824 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19944824C1] The latch device has a switch lever (1) and a relatively pivoted latch lever (2), cooperating with a pivot bearing (3) provided by the contact lever (4), for providing a knee-lever mechanism. The pivot bearing is provided at the opposite end of the contact lever to the contact point (4A), with release of the latch by a rotary movement of the pivot bearing or by a sliding movement of the latch lever.

Abstract (de)

Verklinkungseinrichtung für einen elektrischen Schalter, insbesondere für einen Leitungsschutzschalter, mit einem Schalthebel (1), an dem schwenkbar ein Klinkenhebel (2) angelenkt ist, der mit dem am Kontakthebel (4) angeordneten Klinkenhebelwiderlager (3) ein Kniegelenk (2;3) bildet, durch das eine Übertotpunktlage bewirkt wird. Das Klinkenhebelwiderlager (3) an dem der Kontaktstelle (4A) gegenüberliegenden Arm des Kontakthebels (4) ist so gestaltet und schwenkbar befestigt, daß es zwei unterschiedliche Entklinkungsabläufe zuläßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/50 (2006.01); H01H 71/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/505 (2013.01); H01H 71/526 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19944824 C1 20010201; EP 1085551 A2 20010321; EP 1085551 A3 20030102; EP 1085551 B1 20040211

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041112

2005-01-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-03-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2004-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-02-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-10-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030120

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI