Global Patent Index - EP 1085554 A1

EP 1085554 A1 2001-03-21 - Plasma display panel with UV-light reflecting faceplate coating

Title (en)

Plasma display panel with UV-light reflecting faceplate coating

Title (de)

Plasmabildschirm mit UV-Licht reflektierender Frontplattenbeschichtung

Title (fr)

Ecran à plasma avec plaque frontale munie d'un revêtement réfléchissant la lumière UV

Publication

EP 1085554 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00203158 A

Priority

DE 19944202 A

Abstract (en)

Plasma picture screen comprises a front plate (1) with a glass plate (3) having a dielectric layer (4) and a protective layer (5), and a back plate (2). A number of plasma cells containing gas are also provided and several electrodes (6,7,11) are arranged on the front plate and the back plate to produce quiet electrical charges. A UV-light reflecting layer (8) is formed on the protective layer. Preferred Features: The UV-light reflecting layer is made of e.g. lithium oxide or an oxide of magnesium, calcium, strontium or barium, and has a thickness of 0.5-5 microns m.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung beschreibt einen Plasmabildschirm, insbesondere einen AC-Plasmabildschirm mit koplanarer Anordnung, mit erhöhter Luminanz. Auf die Frontplatte (1), welche eine Glasplatte (3), auf der eine dielektrische Schicht (4) und eine Schutzschicht (5) aufgebracht sind aufweist, wird eine Schicht (8) aufgebracht, die eine hohe Reflexion im Wellenlängenbereich der Plasmaemission (145 bis 200 nm) und eine hohe Transmission im sichtbaren Wellenlängenbereich aufweist. Diese Schicht (8) reflektiert UV-Licht (12), welches in Richtung Frontplatte (1) emittiert wird, in Richtung der Leuchtstoffe (10) zurück. Die optischen Eigenschaften der UV-Licht reflektierenden Schicht (8) werden mit anorganischen Teilchen mit einem Teilchendurchmesser zwischen 200 nm und 500 nm und einer Schichtdicke von 0.5 µm bis 5 µm bzw. mit Agglomeraten aus anorganischen Teilchen mit einem Teilchendurchmesser zwischen 10 nm und 200 nm und einer Schichtdicke von 0.2 µm bis 10 µm realisiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 17/16; H01J 17/49

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/12 (2012.01); H01J 11/44 (2012.01); H01J 61/40 (2006.01); H01J 65/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/12 (2013.01); H01J 11/44 (2013.01); H01J 61/40 (2013.01); H01J 65/046 (2013.01); H01J 2211/442 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085554 A1 20010321; EP 1085554 B1 20051207; DE 19944202 A1 20010322; DE 50011803 D1 20060112; JP 2001118511 A 20010427; JP 4808307 B2 20111102; KR 20010030389 A 20010416; TW 472274 B 20020111; US 6753649 B1 20040622

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140912

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50011803

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140912

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50011803

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130813

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130812

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130813

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-24 [REG FR RM] CORRECTION OF A MATERIAL ERROR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RM

2011-04-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110317 AND 20110323

2011-01-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-08-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-03-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100204 AND 20100211

2006-11-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060908

2006-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011803

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-01-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-12-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI