Global Patent Index - EP 1085596 A1

EP 1085596 A1 2001-03-21 - Rotatable curtain antenna system

Title (en)

Rotatable curtain antenna system

Title (de)

Drehbares Vorhangantennensystem

Title (fr)

Système d'antenne rideau rotatif

Publication

EP 1085596 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99250318 A

Priority

EP 99250318 A

Abstract (en)

The antenna system is composed of a revolving tower shaft (1), at which two arms (4, 6) are respectively fastened at a lower and upper end, and antenna curtains (10) connected with them. Each antenna curtain is equipped with two edge ropes (16) and a roof rope (17), which serve for a carrying and spanning of horizontal and vertical curtain ropes (13, 15). At least one edge rope and the pertinent roof rope are connected with each other and with an upper arm through a rope diversion (19) with an axis fastened at the pertinent upper arm.

Abstract (de)

Ein drehbares Kurzwellen-Vorhangantennensystem besteht aus einem drehbaren Turmschaft (1), an dem unten und oben je zwei Ausleger (4, 6) befestigt sind, und aus damit verbundenen Antennenvorhängen (10), die jeder mit zwei Randseilen (16) und einem Dachseil (17) versehen sind, die zum Tragen und Spannen der horizontalen und vertikalen Vorhangseile (13, 15) dienen. Erfindungsgemäß ist mindestens ein Randseil (16) der Antennenvorhänge (10) und das zugehörige Dachseil (17) durch eine Seilumlenkung (19) mit am zugehörigen oberen Ausleger (6) befestigter Achse miteinander und mit dem oberen Ausleger (6) verbunden. Die Seilumlenkung (19) besteht z. B. aus einem auf der Achse drehbar gelagerten zweiarmigen Winkelhebel, an dessen Armen das Randseil (16) und das Dachseil (17) angeschlossen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/04; H01Q 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/04 (2006.01); H01Q 19/10 (2006.01); H01Q 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 19/108 (2013.01); H01Q 3/04 (2013.01); H01Q 21/062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085596 A1 20010321; EP 1085596 B1 20031119; DE 59907806 D1 20031224

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050910

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050910

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-10-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041001

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040906

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040301

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907806 P 20031224

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000208

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI