Global patent index - EP 1085598 A2

EP 1085598 A2 2001-03-21 - Reflector with shaped surface and spatial separated foci for the illumination of identical areas, antenna system and method for determining the surface

Title (en)

Reflector with shaped surface and spatial separated foci for the illumination of identical areas, antenna system and method for determining the surface

Title (de)

Reflektor mit geformter Oberfläche und räumlich getrennten Foki zur Ausleuchtung identischer Gebiete, Antennensystem und Verfahren zur Oberflächenermittlung

Title (fr)

Réflecteur à surface déformable et à foyers spatialement séparés pour l'illumination de territoires identiques, système d'antenne et méthode pour la détermination de la surface

Publication

EP 1085598 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118245 A

Priority

DE 19945062 A

Abstract (en)

The surface of the reflector (1) comprises a local shaping formed in such way, that the reflector comprises at least one group spatially of separate focus points (10a, 10b, 110a, 110b), whereby electromagnetic beam bundles (5a, 5b, 50a, 50b) are directed through the reflector, outgoing from the group of focus points to a common area (3, 3a, 3b). An Independent claim is provided for an antenna system using the reflector, and a method for determining the surface shaping of the reflector.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Reflektor mit geformter Oberfläche für elektromagnetische Wellen, wobei eine lokale Formgebung des Reflektors (1) derart ausgelegt wird, daß der Reflektor (1) mehrere, räumlich getrennte Foki (10a, 10b, 110a, 110b) aufweist. Es können dadurch von räumlich getrennten Strahlern (4a, 4b, 40a, 40b) ausgehende elektromagnetische Strahlbündel (5a, 5b, 50a, 50b), insbesondere solche verschiedener Frequenz oder Frequenzbänder, die den Reflektor (1) ausleuchten, auf ein gemeinsames Ausleuchtgebiet (3, 3a, 3b) gerichtet werden. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 15/14; H01Q 15/00; H01Q 19/17; H01Q 19/195; H01Q 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 15/00 (2006.01); H01Q 15/14 (2006.01); H01Q 19/17 (2006.01); H01Q 19/195 (2006.01); H01Q 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 25/007 (2013.01); H01Q 15/147 (2013.01); H01Q 19/17 (2013.01); H01Q 19/195 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085598 A2 20010321; EP 1085598 A3 20020731; CA 2317388 A1 20010320; CA 2317388 C 20021224; CN 1289158 A 20010328; DE 19945062 A1 20010412; EP 1321999 A1 20030625; JP 2001127538 A 20010511; JP 5220966 B2 20130626; US 6255997 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-24 [R18R] REFUSED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18R

- Effective date: 20060202

2006-05-03 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20030415

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS ASTRIUM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-04-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASTRIUM GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI