Global Patent Index - EP 1085601 A1

EP 1085601 A1 2001-03-21 - Elastic cage-type clamp terminal

Title (en)

Elastic cage-type clamp terminal

Title (de)

Elastische Käfigklemme

Title (fr)

Borne de raccordement a cage élastique

Publication

EP 1085601 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410106 A

Priority

FR 9911694 A

Abstract (en)

The solder-less nipple for a cable has a cage (112) formed by stamping and bending a metal strip. A locking screw (14) fits in a threaded hole (132) in the upper branch (123) of the cage. The two end branches (123,125) are separated in the unlocked position by a first play (J1) which is closed as the screw is tightened, to increase the locking force. The cage has a double pent shape forming an elastic structure.

Abstract (fr)

Une borne de raccordement est composée d'une cage 112 réalisée par découpage et pliage d'une bande métallique, et d'une vis de serrage 14 logée dans un trou taraudé 132 ménagé dans une branche 123 supérieure. Les deux branches terminales 123,125 de fermeture du cadre élastique sont séparées dans l'état desserré par au moins un premier jeu J1 axial s'étendant dans la direction de déplacement de la vis 14. Des moyens de butée déterminent un premier seuil de serrage après le rattrapage du premier jeu en début de serrage de la vis. La cage 112 devient plus rigide lors du vissage poursuivi de la vis 14 pour augmenter la force de serrage au-delà dudit premier seuil. La cage 112 revient ensuite à sa géométrie initiale au desserrage de la borne. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/36; H01R 4/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/36 (2006.01); H01R 4/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/38 (2013.01); H01R 4/363 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085601 A1 20010321; EP 1085601 B1 20090318; AR 025675 A1 20021211; CN 1186855 C 20050126; CN 1288273 A 20010321; DE 60041800 D1 20090430; ES 2321273 T3 20090604; FR 2798514 A1 20010316; FR 2798514 B1 20011102

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160701

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-03-01 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 60041800

- Effective date: 20111228

2010-02-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091221

2009-06-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-06-04 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2321273 T3

2009-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60041800 P 20090430

2009-04-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2009-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2009-03-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI