Global patent index - EP 1085610 A1

EP 1085610 A1 2001-03-21 - Aluminum connecting clamp for an electrical apparatus especially for a fuse

Title (en)

Aluminum connecting clamp for an electrical apparatus especially for a fuse

Title (de)

Aluminium-Verbindungsklemme für ein Elektrogerät insbesondere für eine Sicherung

Title (fr)

Pince de connexion en aluminium pour un appareillage électrique, notamment un fusible

Publication

EP 1085610 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410105 A

Priority

FR 9911695 A

Abstract (en)

Connection clamp (10) has two contacting jaws (14,16) each with a contacting face (22), a contact block (26,27) complete with a plastic cover (28) and cooling fins (30).

Abstract (fr)

Une pince de connexion comprend deux éléments de contact 14, 16 constitués par des barrettes en aluminium, comportant chacune: une surface de contact 22 convexe disposée dans la partie médiane interne entre l'embase de fixation 36 à la partie postérieure, et un plot 26, 27 saillant jouant le rôle d'éclateur, une chape 28 en matière isolante coiffant la partie antérieure au-dessus du plot 26, 27 pour former un organe d'enclenchement brusque à l'entrée de la pince 10, et des ailettes 30 de dissipation thermique réparties sur la surface externe à l'opposé du plot. Application: raccordement de fusible à borne en forme de couteau. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/18; H01H 85/20; H01R 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/20 (2006.01); H01R 11/22 (2006.01); H01R 13/18 (2006.01); H01H 1/42 (2006.01); H01H 1/62 (2006.01); H01H 9/38 (2006.01); H01H 85/47 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 11/22 (2013.01); H01H 85/203 (2013.01); H01R 13/18 (2013.01); H01H 1/42 (2013.01); H01H 1/62 (2013.01); H01H 9/38 (2013.01); H01H 85/47 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085610 A1 20010321; BR 0004167 A 20010417; CN 1157824 C 20040714; CN 1288274 A 20010321; DZ 3092 A1 20040620; EG 22168 A 20020930; FR 2798515 A1 20010316; FR 2798515 B1 20011109; MA 25161 A1 20010402; OA 11617 A 20040910

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040302

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES GB IT

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI