Global Patent Index - EP 1085615 A1

EP 1085615 A1 2001-03-21 - Connector system

Title (en)

Connector system

Title (de)

Steckverbindungsystem

Title (fr)

Système connecteur

Publication

EP 1085615 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99112454 A

Priority

EP 99112454 A

Abstract (en)

A connector unit 1 comprises a central tubular body 2 having a first longitudinally protruding half-moon front portion 3 with an outwardly opened latch catching groove 6 formed on said first longitudinally protruding half-moon front portion 3. A latching shell 16 affixed to the central tubular body has a longitudinally protruding resilient tongue 18 having an inwardly projecting latch 19 diametrically opposed to said outwardly opened latch catching groove 6. A control sleeve 24 is mounted for longitudinal movement on the central tubular body 2 and comprises a second longitudinally protruding half-moon front portion 26 diametrically opposed to the first longitudinally protruding half-moon front portion 3 and a rearwardly opened inner slot 27 partly engaged under the inwardly projecting latch 19. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6277 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085615 A1 20010321; EP 1085615 B1 20021009; AT 225987 T 20021015; DE 69903427 D1 20021114; DE 69903427 T2 20030710; DK 1085615 T3 20021230; ES 2185275 T3 20030416

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: REUTELER AND CIE S.A., CH

2017-03-31 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: CHEMINS DES CHAMPS-COURBES 28, 1024 ECUBLENS (CH)

2017-03-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160615

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160617

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185275 T3

2002-12-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903427 20021114

2002-11-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-10-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225987 T 20021015

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTERLEMO HOLDING S.A.

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000529

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI