Global Patent Index - EP 1085619 A1

EP 1085619 A1 2001-03-21 - Current conducting contact pin provided with a ball

Title (en)

Current conducting contact pin provided with a ball

Title (de)

Strom leitender Stift mit einer Kugel

Title (fr)

Broche de contact courant conductrice avec une boule

Publication

EP 1085619 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99610056 A

Priority

EP 99610056 A

Abstract (en)

A current conducting contact pin (1) comprising a housing (4), at least one pin (5) and a spring element (6). The pin (5) has an external end extending beyond the housing (4) and an internal end located inside the housing (4). Means are provided for restricting the extension of the pin (5) outside the housing (4). The pin (5) is slidably located in the housing (4) and the spring element (6) forces the pin (5) to be in its outermost position. The contact pin in characterised in that the external end of the pin (5) comprises a seat (8) in which a ball (7) is rotatably mounted. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 39/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/643 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1085619 A1 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070403

2004-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL)

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991014;LT PAYMENT 19991014;LV PAYMENT 19991014;MK PAYMENT 19991014;RO PAYMENT 19991014;SI PAYMENT 19991014

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991014;LT PAYMENT 19991014;LV PAYMENT 19991014;MK PAYMENT 19991014;RO PAYMENT 19991014;SI PAYMENT 19991014