Global Patent Index - EP 1085828 A1

EP 1085828 A1 2001-03-28 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING COMPLETE ZIP FASTENER HALVES WITH A SELVEDGE ON BOTH SIDES IN A SINGLE OPERATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING COMPLETE ZIP FASTENER HALVES WITH A SELVEDGE ON BOTH SIDES IN A SINGLE OPERATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VOLLSTÄNDIGEN REISSVERSCHLUSSHÄLFTEN MIT BEIDSEITIGER WEBKANTE IN EINEM ARBEITSGANG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE DES DEMI-FERMETURES A GLISSIERE COMPLETES, PRESENTANT UNE LISIERE DES DEUX COTES, EN UNE SEULE OPERATION

Publication

EP 1085828 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936338 A

Priority

  • DE 9901568 W
  • DE 19824432 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19824432C1] The production of a hooked pile closure half comprises forming a closure strip (3) with a woven carrier strip (1) into which a sliding clasp fastener strip formed of plastic mono-filament (8) is woven. The mono-filament is retained by a woven thread (4) on one side of the carrier strip. An Independent claim is also included for the apparatus for the production of the above fastener strip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 19/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/54 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962367A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19824432 C1 19991111; AU 5150399 A 19991220; DE 19980967 D2 20020314; EP 1085828 A1 20010328; EP 1085828 B1 20030820; JP 2002516681 A 20020611; US 2001017167 A1 20010830; US 6435219 B2 20020820; WO 9962367 A1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WILLIAM *PRYM G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-05-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050518

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050318

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050316

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-12-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906688 P 20030925

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-04-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PRODUCING ZIP FASTENER HALVES

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020701

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB