Global Patent Index - EP 1085833 A1

EP 1085833 A1 2001-03-28 - METHOD AND DEVICE IN A CLEANING MACHINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE IN A CLEANING MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG IN EINER TROCKENREINIGUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF CONCERNANT UNE MACHINE A NETTOYER

Publication

EP 1085833 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99925506 A

Priority

  • SE 9900590 W
  • SE 9801343 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9953822A1] A method and a device for separating granules from a return flow of a cleaning fluid being a mixture of a liquid and granules having a higher density than the liquid, the return flow appearing through a treatment chamber (10) and a tank (15) below the treatment chamber (10) in a washing machine having at least one granule collector (19). The granule collector (19) is arranged as a self-contained unit and to enter a collect mode to receive a substantial amount of the return flow and to retain granules therein. The granule collector (19) is also arranged to enter a release mode to release retained granules and to allow the return flow to pass by without retaining granules.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/00; A47L 15/14; A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); A47L 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/0002 (2013.01); A47L 15/0094 (2013.01); A47L 2601/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953822A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9953822 A1 19991028; AU 4176899 A 19991108; CN 100396226 C 20080625; CN 1296396 A 20010523; DE 69906521 D1 20030508; DE 69906521 T2 20040401; EP 1085833 A1 20010328; EP 1085833 B1 20030402; JP 2002512064 A 20020423; JP 4228067 B2 20090225; SE 521117 C2 20030930; SE 9801343 D0 19980417; SE 9801343 L 19991018

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69906521

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130413

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130413

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120427

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906521 P 20030508

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROGMARK, BERTIL

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT