Global Patent Index - EP 1085859 A1

EP 1085859 A1 2001-03-28 - WOUND TREATMENT THROUGH INHIBITION OF ADENOSINE DIPHOSPHATE RIBOSYL TRANSFERASE

Title (en)

WOUND TREATMENT THROUGH INHIBITION OF ADENOSINE DIPHOSPHATE RIBOSYL TRANSFERASE

Title (de)

WUNDBEHANDLUNG ZUR HEMMUNG DER ADENOSINETRIPHOSPHOTERIBOSYLTRANSFERASE

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT DES BLESSURES PAR INHIBITION D'ADENOSINE DIPHOSPHATE-RIBOSYL TRANSFERASE

Publication

EP 1085859 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927490 A

Priority

  • US 9913264 W
  • US 8892498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963982A1] The present invention pertains to a method for healing a wound in a mammal which comprises the steps of (A) providing a therapeutic wound healing composition comprising a therapeutically effective amount of an inhibitor of mono-adenosine diphosphate-ribosyl transferase to inhibit adenosine diphosphate-ribosylation of vascular endothelial growth factor, and (B) contacting the therapeutic wound healing composition with a wound in a mammal. This invention also pertains to wound healing compositions and to methods for preparing and using the wound healing compositions and the pharmaceutical products in which the therapeutic compositions may be used. This invention further pertains to therapeutic dermatological-wound healing compositions useful to minimize and treat diaper dermatitis and to methods for preparing and using the therapeutic dermatological-wound healing compositions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/045

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/12 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9963982 A1 19991216; AU 4438399 A 19991230; CA 2329160 A1 19991216; EP 1085859 A1 20010328; EP 1085859 A4 20030226; JP 2002517436 A 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031111

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-02-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030113

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/045 A

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/12 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/455 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/35 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/70 B

2003-02-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/37 B

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE