Global Patent Index - EP 1085860 A1

EP 1085860 A1 2001-03-28 - FORMULATIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF GASTRO-OESOPHAGEAL REFLUX

Title (en)

FORMULATIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF GASTRO-OESOPHAGEAL REFLUX

Title (de)

FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MAGEN-SPEISERÖHREN REFLUX

Title (fr)

FORMULATIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU REFLUX GASTRO-OESOPHAGIEN

Publication

EP 1085860 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99955420 A

Priority

  • GB 9901717 W
  • GB 9812426 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2338186A] Formulations for the treatment of gastro-oesophageal reflux disease which include a carrier vehicle and a gastroprotective agent. The carrier vehicle is either capable of forming a floating barrier layer on contact with gastric acid, or of forming a bioadhesive film before contact with gastric acid occurs, so as to protect gastric mucosa from irritation by the gastric acid. The gastroprotective agents include capsaicin, zingerone curcumin, piperine, resiniferatoxin or crude extracts of capsicum, black pepper, cayenne pepper, paprika, mace, mustard, ginger turmeric or papaya seeds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/165; A61K 9/20; A61K 9/60; A61K 31/12; A61K 31/335; A61K 31/445

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/50 (2006.01); A61K 9/60 (2006.01); A61K 31/12 (2006.01); A61K 31/165 (2006.01); A61K 31/357 (2006.01); A61K 31/4525 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/0065 (2013.01); A61K 9/006 (2013.01); A61K 9/5036 (2013.01); A61K 31/12 (2013.01); A61K 31/165 (2013.01); A61K 31/357 (2013.01); A61K 31/4525 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963986A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

GB 2338186 A 19991215; GB 9912509 D0 19990728; AU 4274799 A 19991230; AU 763348 B2 20030717; DE 69903543 D1 20021121; DE 69903543 T2 20030626; EP 1085860 A1 20010328; EP 1085860 B1 20021016; ES 2183618 T3 20030316; GB 9812426 D0 19980805; US 6348502 B1 20020219; WO 9963986 A1 19991216; ZA 200100089 B 20020913

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050602

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-10-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2005-06-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183618 T3

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903543 20021121

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-10-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RECKITT BENCKISER HEALTHCARE (UK) LIMITED

2002-01-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/165 A, 7A 61K 31/12 B, 7A 61K 31/445 B, 7A 61K 31/335 B, 7A 61K 9/20 B, 7A 61K 9/60 B, 7A 61P 1/04 B

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010424

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010109

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT