Global Patent Index - EP 1085872 A1

EP 1085872 A1 2001-03-28 - INHIBITORS OF TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR NF-$g(k)B

Title (en)

INHIBITORS OF TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR NF-$g(k)B

Title (de)

INHIBITOREN DES NFKAPPA-BTRANSKRIPTIONSFAKTORS

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DU FACTEUR DE TRANSCRIPTION NF-$g(k)B

Publication

EP 1085872 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99930459 A

Priority

  • US 9913897 W
  • US 9001698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965495A1] The present invention provides amino-indanone inhibitors of transcription factor NF- kappa B and pharmaceutically acceptable salts, hydrates and solvates thereof, pharmaceutical compositions of such compounds, and methods for treating diseases in which activation of NF- kappa B is implicated. More specifically, the present invention provides methods of treatment of a variety of diseases associated with NF- kappa B activation including inflammatory disorders; particularly rheumatoid arthritis, inflammatory bowel disease, and asthma; dermatosis, including psoriasis and acute dermatosis; autoimmune diseases; tissue and organ rejection; Alzheimer's disease; stroke; atherosclerosis; restenosis; cancer, including Hodgkins disease; and certain viral infections, including AIDS; osteoarthritis; osteoporosis; and Ataxia Telangiestasia by administering to a patient in need thereof a compound of the present invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/535; A61K 31/135; A61K 31/40; A61K 31/445; A61K 31/495

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 295/10 (2006.01); A61K 31/135 (2006.01); A61K 31/4453 (2006.01); A61K 31/4462 (2006.01); A61K 31/5375 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/04 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/135 (2013.01); A61K 31/4462 (2013.01); A61K 31/5375 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9965495 A1 19991223; AR 019871 A1 20020320; AU 4699699 A 20000105; BR 9911151 A 20010306; CA 2335293 A1 19991223; CN 1306428 A 20010801; CO 5080752 A1 20010925; CZ 20004760 A3 20010815; EP 1085872 A1 20010328; EP 1085872 A4 20030416; HU 0102492 A2 20011128; IL 140324 D0 20020210; JP 2002518333 A 20020625; NO 20006452 A 20010216; NO 20006452 D0 20001218; PL 345577 A1 20011217; TR 200003779 T2 20010621; ZA 200007448 B 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-25 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1035668

2003-07-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030103

2003-04-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/535 A

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/495 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/445 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/40 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/135 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 11/06 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 17/06 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 19/02 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 19/10 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 31/18 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 35/00 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 37/06 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 29/00 B

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001213

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001213