Global Patent Index - EP 1085902 A2

EP 1085902 A2 2001-03-28 - THERAPEUTIC COMPOSITIONS THAT PRODUCE AN IMMUNE RESPONSE BY ALTERING THE ANTIGEN

Title (en)

THERAPEUTIC COMPOSITIONS THAT PRODUCE AN IMMUNE RESPONSE BY ALTERING THE ANTIGEN

Title (de)

THERAPEUTISCHER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DIE EINE IMMUNANTWORT DURCH ÄNDERUNG VOM ANTIGEN ANREGT

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS THERAPEUTIQUES PRODUISANT UNE REPONSE IMMUNITAIRE PAR RENOUVELLEMENT DES ANTIGENES

Publication

EP 1085902 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99925215 A

Priority

  • IB 9901114 W
  • US 9459898 A
  • US 15269898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965517A2] The invention concerns methods and compositions for stimulating a host's immune response, particularly for the treatment of cancer. The methods and compositions according to the invention use binding agents such as antibodies to generate an immune response to a predetermined soluble antigen. In accordance with the invention, the binding agent-soluble antigen complex alters the immunogenic condition of the host by generating new immunogens that are recognizable by the immune system. This leads to a humoral and/or cellular immune response.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/00; A61K 39/395; A61K 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 41/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C07K 16/30 (2006.01); C07K 16/42 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/4266 (2013.01); A61K 41/0042 (2013.01); C07K 16/3015 (2013.01); C07K 16/3069 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); C07K 2317/34 (2013.01); C07K 2317/734 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965517A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9965517 A2 19991223; WO 9965517 A3 20000203; AU 4159399 A 20000105; AU 762699 B2 20030703; CA 2333221 A1 19991223; EP 1085902 A2 20010328; EP 1820514 A2 20070822; EP 1820514 A3 20071017; IL 139832 A 20060820; IL 139832 D0 20020210; JP 2002518342 A 20020625

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070221

2006-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALTAREX MEDICAL CORPORATION

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALTAREX MEDICAL CORP.

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040402

2001-11-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MADIYALAKAN, RAGUPATHY

2001-11-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHULTES, BIRGIT C.

2001-11-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BAUM, RICHARD P.

2001-11-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NOUJAIM, ANTOINE A.

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE