Global Patent Index - EP 1085934 A1

EP 1085934 A1 2001-03-28 - TRIBOELECTRIC AIR FILTER

Title (en)

TRIBOELECTRIC AIR FILTER

Title (de)

REIBUNGSELEKTRISCHER LUFTFILTER

Title (fr)

FILTRE A AIR TRIBOELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1085934 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98921296 A

Priority

CA 9800470 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9958224A1] The invention concerns a triboelectric air filter comprising polypropylene fibres (1) mixed with isophthalamide polymetaphenylene fibres (2). Preferably, the fibre (1) fibre (2) ratio ranges between 5:95 and 50:50, and more preferably between 10:90 and 30:70. Said air filter surface mass which is in the form of a nonwoven, preferably ranges between 15 and 500 g/m<2>. Said filter is highly efficient and is designed to be used in all appliances wherein air filtering is required.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 39/16; B01D 39/00; B01D 46/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 39/16 (2006.01); B01D 39/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/4291 (2013.01); B03C 3/30 (2013.01); D04H 1/4342 (2013.01); D04H 1/4382 (2013.01); Y10T 442/637 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958224A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9958224 A1 19991118; AU 7420898 A 19991129; CA 2330805 A1 19991118; CA 2330805 C 20030902; DE 69804361 D1 20020425; DE 69804361 T2 20021010; EP 1085934 A1 20010328; EP 1085934 B1 20020320; JP 2002514494 A 20020521; US 6328788 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160617

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804361 20020425

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001108

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT