Global patent index - EP 1085950 A1

EP 1085950 A1 2001-03-28 - A DEVICE FOR CLAMPING A VEHICLE TO A BENCH ATTACHMENT

Title (en)

A DEVICE FOR CLAMPING A VEHICLE TO A BENCH ATTACHMENT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN EINES FAHRZEUGS AUF EINER RICHTBANK

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN VEHICULE A UN MARBRE

Publication

EP 1085950 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99930019 A

Priority

  • SE 9900891 W
  • SE 9802038 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964179A1] An arrangement for use in clamping a vehicle to a straightening bench. The arrangement includes a support arm (6) whose one leg is provided with means for fitting the arm into a mounting groove (3) that extends along the sides of said bench. The other leg of the arm is intended to support clamping means for clamping a vehicle chassis to the arm. The means for fitting one leg of the support arm (6) in the mounting groove of the straightening bench include two mounting jaws (12, 15). A first (12) of these jaws is fixed to the arm (6) and intended to grip behind a flange (5) along one edge of the groove (3). The other jaw (15) is moveable relative to the first jaw and displaceable towards said jaw while overcoming a spring force (17) and is intended to grip behind a flange (4) along the other edge of the groove (3). The arm can therewith be fitted into the groove by swinging the arm upwards (A) when the lower jaw (12) rests in the lower part of the mounting groove (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 1/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964179A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964179 A1 19991216; CN 1163320 C 20040825; CN 1304341 A 20010718; DE 69907670 D1 20030612; DE 69907670 T2 20040325; EP 1085950 A1 20010328; EP 1085950 B1 20030507; SE 510289 C2 19990510; SE 9802038 D0 19980609; SE 9802038 L 19990510

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110526

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110526

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110526

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69907670

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100527

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-02-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69907670

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001023

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT