Global Patent Index - EP 1085963 A1

EP 1085963 A1 2001-03-28 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AN ABRUPT FEED MOTION

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PRODUCING AN ABRUPT FEED MOTION

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER SCHLAGARTIGEN VORSCHUBBEWEGUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE UN MOUVEMENT D'AVANCE BRUTAL

Publication

EP 1085963 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99952084 A

Priority

  • DE 19822081 A
  • EP 9903363 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822081A1] The hand-held trigger-operated driver drives a bolt (12) abruptly into a hard surface esp. concrete. The bolt is accelerated and driven by a spring. The spring is progressively pre-tensioned by an electric motor powered e.g. by a battery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/00; B25C 1/04; B25C 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/00 (2006.01); B25C 1/04 (2006.01); B25C 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/048 (2013.01); B25C 1/00 (2013.01); B25C 1/04 (2013.01); B25C 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959779A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822081 A1 19991118; AU 4262699 A 19991206; EP 1085963 A1 20010328; HR P20000780 A2 20010831; HU 0101499 A2 20010828; HU 0101499 A3 20010928; PL 344159 A1 20011008; SK 17162000 A3 20010409; US 6655472 B1 20031202; WO 9959779 A1 19991125; WO 9959779 A8 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041117

2003-01-02 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20001205

2001-04-25 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE