Global Patent Index - EP 1085964 A1

EP 1085964 A1 2001-03-28 - HAIR-CUTTING DEVICE

Title (en)

HAIR-CUTTING DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG FÜR DAS SCHNEIDEN VON HAAREN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR LA COUPE DES CHEVEUX

Publication

EP 1085964 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920453 A

Priority

  • AT 9900124 W
  • AT 91398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961210A1] A device that can be used to cut hair, comprising a support with a grip section and, on the front part of the support, opposite the grip section, at least one blade that is directed in a perpendicular position with respect to the longitudinal extension of said support. At least one protuberance (15) is provided next to the blade (12). Hair can be trimmed both selectively and specifically with the aid of said device which can be guided by the protuberance along the head. Preferably, the device is configured as a pair of scissors to cut hair, comprising two cutting blades (1, 2) that are hingedly connected to each other. On the front ends of one cutting blade (1,2) or both cutting blades (1,2) and located opposite the grip rings are blades (12) with cutting edges that are directed perpendicular to the longitudinal extension of said cutting blades (1,2). Protuberances are provided close to the blades (12) to enable the scissors to be guided along the scalp.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 13/08 (2006.01); B26B 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 13/24 (2013.01); B26B 13/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961210A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961210 A1 19991202; AT 406561 B 20000626; AT A91398 A 19991115; AU 3802999 A 19991213; EP 1085964 A1 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011207

2001-11-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HAIR-CUTTING SCISORS

2001-10-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001108

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE