Global Patent Index - EP 1085985 A1

EP 1085985 A1 2001-03-28 - A BOOKBINDING REPAIR KIT

Title (en)

A BOOKBINDING REPAIR KIT

Title (de)

REPARATURKIT FÜR BUCHBINDUNG

Title (fr)

KIT DE REPARATION DE RELIURE

Publication

EP 1085985 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98911305 A

Priority

NZ 9800037 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947363A1] A bookbinding repair kit containing instructions, diagrams and equipment to carry out repair to damaged or torn backing shoulder joints of any book, the equipment comprising a complete endpaper consisting of one evenly folded sheet of paper with a double-sideed adhesive strip no less than 7 mm and no more than 10 mm in width but of a particular length, with a peel away backing paper attached to the endpaper adjacent one side of the endpaper fold, a double-sided self adhesive strip of mull cloth of a particular width and length, two thirds of each side of the mull cloth being covered with a peel away backing strip and the remaining third adhered to the adhesive side of a scorelined, one sided self-adhesive paper the same size as the endpaper, the endpaper side without the adhesive strip being glued to the plain side of the scorelined paper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42C 17/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947363 A1 19990923; AU 6528998 A 19991011; AU 753806 B2 20021031; CA 2324317 A1 19990923; EP 1085985 A1 20010328; EP 1085985 A4 20050112; US 6601874 B1 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1037869

2006-12-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051003

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-01-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041125

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001019

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE