Global Patent Index - EP 1086021 A2

EP 1086021 A2 2001-03-28 - BARREL WITH PLASTIC LID

Title (en)

BARREL WITH PLASTIC LID

Title (de)

KUNSTSTOFF-DECKELFASS

Title (fr)

FUT A COUVERCLE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 1086021 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99939772 A

Priority

  • DE 29809484 U
  • EP 9903640 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961323A2] The invention relates to a barrel (10) having a plastic lid, comprising a barrel body (12), a lid (14) and a clamping ring (16). Known lidded barrels have the disadvantage that when they are filled with liquids their liquid-tightness is comparatively poor owing to the large lid diameter in relation to bung or screw-top seals. The aim of the invention is to obtain better tightness, especially in case of high internal pressure or if the barrel falls (impact pressure), by providing a stronger joint between the barrel lid and the barrel opening rim. To this end the barrel lid (14) has an additional rotationally symmetrical seal element (36) within its U-shaped lid edge (20) and the packing seal (22) is arranged between the external circular lid element (26) and the seal element (36). A circular free space (38) which is open to the bottom is configured between the seal element (36) and the internal circular lid element (28) and the seal element (36) and the internal lid element (28) are situated at a distance from each other and connected with each other only via an upper joint (40).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/06 (2006.01); B65D 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 45/32 (2006.01); B65D 47/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/121 (2013.01); B65D 43/0218 (2013.01); B65D 45/32 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00092 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/005 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00509 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00555 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00972 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0099 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961323A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961323 A2 19991202; WO 9961323 A3 20000203; AT 273177 T 20040815; AU 4266699 A 19991213; BR 9911604 A 20011002; BR 9911604 B1 20090113; CA 2333473 A1 19991202; CA 2333473 C 20080219; DE 19980934 D2 20010621; EP 1086021 A2 20010328; EP 1086021 B1 20040811; ES 2226419 T3 20050316; JP 2002516234 A 20020604; JP 4199928 B2 20081224; US 6401957 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170518

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-04-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20080924

2009-01-21 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20080924

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070526

2007-09-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MAUSER-WERKE GMBH

- Effective date: 20070718

2007-07-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MAUSER-WERKE GMBH

2006-05-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCHUETZ GMBH & CO. KGAA

2005-07-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHUETZ GMBH & CO. KGAA

- Effective date: 20050507

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226419 T3

2005-01-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041216

2004-11-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-11-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-11-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910215 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAUSER-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020606

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010102

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE