Global patent index - EP 1086029 A1

EP 1086029 A1 2001-03-28 - HINGE LID PACK FOR CIGARETTES OR SUCH LIKE

Title (en)

HINGE LID PACK FOR CIGARETTES OR SUCH LIKE

Title (de)

KLAPPSCHACHTEL FÜR ZIGARETTEN ODER DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

PAQUET A COUVERCLE BASCULANT POUR CIGARETTES OU SIMILAIRES

Publication

EP 1086029 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926479 A

Priority

  • DE 19826621 A
  • DE 19858781 A
  • EP 9903747 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6457580B1] Hinge-lid box for cigarettes or the like, comprising a box part (10) and lid (11) and a collar (35) which is positioned in the box part (10) and projects out of the same by way of a top collar part (39), the lid (11) enclosing the top collar part (39) in the closed position. Fastened on the inside of a lid front wall (17) is a lid inner tab (32) which, merely in the region of a (relatively long) side edge (50), has a recess (52) which ensures form-fitting interlocking with a ridge (42) in the region of a collar front wall (36) when the lid is closed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/10; B65D 5/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/66 (2006.01); B65D 85/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/1045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965796A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

US 6457580 B1 20021001; AU 4371999 A 20000105; BR 9912165 A 20010410; CN 1131827 C 20031224; CN 1305426 A 20010725; DE 59913331 D1 20060524; EP 1086029 A1 20010328; EP 1086029 B1 20060412; ID 28157 A 20010510; JP 2002526333 A 20020820; PL 194970 B1 20070731; PL 345003 A1 20011119; US 2002179464 A1 20021205; US 6591982 B2 20030715; WO 9965796 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150515

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150512

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2014-12-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20141201

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140131

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130510

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070115

2006-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060512

2006-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59913331

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-05-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2006-04-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO.)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL