Global patent index - EP 1086039 A1

EP 1086039 A1 2001-03-28 - DUPLICATE LAYOUT OF CONTROL LEVER SETS OF A DISTRIBUTOR OF HYDRAULIC EQUIPMENT FOR TRUCKS, PARTICULARLY HYDRAULIC CRANES

Title (en)

DUPLICATE LAYOUT OF CONTROL LEVER SETS OF A DISTRIBUTOR OF HYDRAULIC EQUIPMENT FOR TRUCKS, PARTICULARLY HYDRAULIC CRANES

Title (de)

DOPPELANORDNUNG VON STEUERHEBELN EINES VERTEILERS FÜR HYDRAULISCHE GERÄTE EINES LASTKRAFTWAGENS, INSBESONDERE FÜR HYDRAULISCHE KRÄNE

Title (fr)

AMENAGEMENT DUPLIQUE D'ENSEMBLES DE LEVIERS DE COMMANDE D'UN DISTRIBUTEUR D'EQUIPEMENT HYDRAULIQUE POUR CAMIONS, NOTAMMENT POUR GRUES HYDRAULIQUES

Publication

EP 1086039 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99929159 A

Priority

  • EP 9903969 W
  • IT TO980109 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965815A1] A duplicate layout of sets (11-12) of control levers of a distributor (10) of hydraulic equipment for trucks, particularly hydraulic cranes, wherein a direct control set (11) is provided with levers (110a-e) whose respective arms are axially aligned with first forks (13'a-e) for the articulation of the ends of corresponding transmission rods (14a-e) and the other duplicate control set (12) is provided with levers (120a-e) whose arms are axially offset with respect to second forks (13''a-e) for the articulation of the other ends of the transmission rods (14a-e), each one of the axially offset arms being connected to the corresponding second forks (13''a-e) by means of its own arm portion (121a-e) which is folded substantially at right angles and runs parallel to the axis of the pivoting shaft (15) of the second articulation forks (13''a-e).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 13/56; E02F 9/20; F15B 13/042; G05G 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/56 (2006.01); E02F 9/20 (2006.01); F15B 13/042 (2006.01); G05G 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/56 (2013.01); E02F 9/2004 (2013.01); F15B 13/0422 (2013.01); G05G 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965815A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9965815 A1 19991223; AT 226918 T 20021115; AU 4606899 A 20000105; DE 69903725 D1 20021205; DE 69903725 T2 20030612; EP 1086039 A1 20010328; EP 1086039 B1 20021030; ES 2186370 T3 20030501; IT 245853 Y1 20020326; IT TO980109 U1 19991216

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150609

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2186370

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69903725

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-05

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT SE

2002-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 226918

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010409

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010109

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT SE