Global Patent Index - EP 1086053 A1

EP 1086053 A1 2001-03-28 - METHOD OF MAKING AN OPTICAL FIBER PREFORM

Title (en)

METHOD OF MAKING AN OPTICAL FIBER PREFORM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VORFORM VON OPTISCHEN FASERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER UNE PREFORME DE FIBRE OPTIQUE

Publication

EP 1086053 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916592 A

Priority

  • US 9907872 W
  • US 5820798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9952832A1] Glass soot (130) is deposited on a glass rod by a burner (140). The body is stretched (126). More depositing and stretching is effected. The final body is then drawn into a fiber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03B 23/047; C03B 37/027

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03B 23/047 (2006.01); C03B 37/012 (2006.01); C03B 37/014 (2006.01); C03B 37/018 (2006.01); C03B 37/027 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03B 37/01861 (2013.01); C03B 37/01413 (2013.01); C03B 37/01426 (2013.01); C03B 37/01466 (2013.01); C03B 37/01823 (2013.01); C03B 2201/02 (2013.01); C03B 2201/12 (2013.01); C03B 2201/28 (2013.01); C03B 2201/31 (2013.01); C03B 2201/32 (2013.01); C03B 2201/42 (2013.01); C03B 2203/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9952832 A1 19991021; WO 9952832 A8 19991229; WO 9952832 A9 20000217; AU 3488499 A 19991101; AU 750390 B2 20020718; BR 9909569 A 20021105; BR 9909569 B1 20100727; CA 2328143 A1 19991021; CN 1295169 C 20070117; CN 1332702 A 20020123; EP 1086053 A1 20010328; EP 1086053 A4 20080305; JP 2003510234 A 20030318; JP 4375902 B2 20091202; RU 2235071 C2 20040827; ZA 9902666 B 19991013

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121101

2012-11-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036044

2008-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080717

2008-03-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080205

2008-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C03B 23/047 20060101AFI19991026BHEP

2008-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C03B 37/027 20060101ALI20080131BHEP

2008-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C03B 37/018 20060101ALI20080131BHEP

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001106

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE