Global Patent Index - EP 1086054 A1

EP 1086054 A1 2001-03-28 - MAN-MADE VITREOUS FIBRES BATTS AND THEIR PRODUCTION

Title (en)

MAN-MADE VITREOUS FIBRES BATTS AND THEIR PRODUCTION

Title (de)

SYNTHETISCHE GLASFASERMATTEN UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

MATELAS DE FIBRES VITREUSES SYNTHETIQUES ET LEUR PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1086054 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99917824 A

Priority

  • EP 99917824 A
  • EP 9901806 W
  • EP 98302661 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951535A1] A man-made vitreous fibre batt is made using two or more centrifugal spinners (1, 2, 3) arranged in side-by-side relationship by fiberising melt on the spinners and collecting the fibres on a conveyor (5) as a web, and cross-lapping the web to make a batt, wherein two or more fiberising parameters selected from the physical properties, chemical analysis, melt flow, position, acceleration field or air flow field are adjusted in order to control the thickness properties of the batt. Both the process and the apparatus is novel. By the invention it is possible to obtain a batt having differing properties in the core (12) from either or both of the face sections (10, 11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03B 37/05; C03B 37/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03B 37/05 (2006.01); C03B 37/07 (2006.01); D04H 1/4218 (2012.01); D04H 1/4226 (2012.01); D04H 1/58 (2012.01); D04H 1/70 (2012.01); D04H 1/732 (2012.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01); D04H 3/004 (2012.01); D04H 3/12 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/74 (2013.01); D04H 1/4218 (2013.01); D04H 1/4226 (2013.01); D04H 1/655 (2013.01); D04H 1/732 (2013.01); D04H 3/004 (2013.01); D04H 3/12 (2013.01); D04H 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951535A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951535 A1 19991014; AT 283244 T 20041215; AU 3597199 A 19991025; DE 69922192 D1 20041230; DE 69922192 T2 20060216; DE 69922192 T3 20101014; EP 1086054 A1 20010328; EP 1086054 B1 20041124; EP 1086054 B2 20100414; ES 2232129 T3 20050516; ES 2232129 T5 20100714; HU 0103092 A2 20020128; HU 0103092 A3 20070828; HU 228317 B1 20130328; PL 191294 B1 20060428; PL 343457 A1 20010813; SI 1086054 T1 20050630; SI 1086054 T2 20100831

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180328

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170318

2018-01-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20171213

2018-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170318

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2018-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-12-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171130

2017-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170318

2017-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 283244 T

- Effective date: 20170318

2017-11-08 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69922192

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2014-01-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69922192

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2014-01-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69922192

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2010-07-27 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2010-07-14 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2010-07-07 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-04-14 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20100414

2010-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB NL PT SE

2010-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI

2009-12-30 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS FOR FORMING A MAN-MADE VITREOUS FIBRE WEB

2008-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PAROC OY AB

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050424

2007-12-26 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PAROC OY AB

- Effective date: 20050822

2005-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PAROC GROUP OY AB

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PAROC GROUP OY AB

- Effective date: 20050822

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232129 T3

2005-03-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922192 P 20041230

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB NL PT SE

2004-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI

2004-11-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021112

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001006