Global Patent Index - EP 1086066 A1

EP 1086066 A1 2001-03-28 - MUSCARINIC RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

MUSCARINIC RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

MUSKARINREZEPTORANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DES RECEPTEURS MUSCARINIQUES

Publication

EP 1086066 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99928444 A

Priority

  • US 9912733 W
  • US 8846698 P
  • US 9293898 P
  • US 12028799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964043A1] Disclosed are multibinding compounds which are muscarinic receptor antagonists. The multibinding compounds of this invention containing from 2 to 10 ligands covalently attached to one or more linkers. Each ligand is, independently of each other, a muscarinic receptor antagonist or an allosteric modulator provided that at least one of said ligand is a muscarinic receptor antagonist. The multibinding compounds of this invention are useful in the treatment and prevention of diseases such as chronic obstructive pulmonary disease, chronic bronchitis, irritable bowel syndrome, urinary incontinence, and the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07B 61/00; A61K 38/00; A61K 39/00; A61K 39/44; A61K 39/395; A61K 51/00; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/543; G01N 33/566

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A01N 43/00 (2006.01); A01N 55/02 (2006.01); A61K 31/135 (2006.01); A61K 31/33 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/404 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/45 (2006.01); A61K 31/4523 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61K 31/455 (2006.01); A61K 31/498 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 39/44 (2006.01); A61K 51/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 1/06 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 13/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 217/10 (2006.01); C07D 207/08 (2006.01); C07D 209/00 (2006.01); C07D 209/32 (2006.01); C07D 209/48 (2006.01); C07D 211/00 (2006.01); C07D 211/44 (2006.01); C07D 211/46 (2006.01); C07D 221/24 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 401/14 (2006.01); C07D 403/06 (2006.01); C07D 451/00 (2006.01); C07D 451/06 (2006.01); C07D 451/10 (2006.01); C07D 487/18 (2006.01); C07K 2/00 (2006.01); C07K 4/00 (2006.01); C07K 5/02 (2006.01); C40B 20/00 (2006.01); C40B 40/02 (2006.01); C40B 40/04 (2006.01); C40B 50/06 (2006.01); C40B 60/10 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 211/12 (2013.01); C07D 209/32 (2013.01); C07D 211/44 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 401/14 (2013.01); C07D 403/06 (2013.01); C07D 403/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964043 A1 19991216; WO 9964043 A9 20000302; AR 018629 A1 20011128; AU 4550899 A 19991230; AU 763638 B2 20030731; CA 2315883 A1 19991216; EP 1086066 A1 20010328; EP 1086066 A4 20010808; JP 2002517464 A 20020618; NZ 505329 A 20030530; SG 80041 A1 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031121

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THERAVANCE, INC.

2001-08-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010625

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07B 61/00 A, 7A 61K 38/00 B, 7A 61K 39/00 B, 7A 61K 39/44 B, 7A 61K 39/395 B, 7A 61K 51/00 B, 7G 01N 33/53 B, 7G 01N 33/543 B, 7G 01N 33/566 B, 7C 07D 209/00 B, 7C 07D 211/00 B, 7C 07D 221/24 B

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000616

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE