Global Patent Index - EP 1086083 A1

EP 1086083 A1 2001-03-28 - PROTEASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

PROTEASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

PROTEASEINHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE PROTEASES

Publication

EP 1086083 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99928614 A

Priority

  • US 9913334 W
  • US 8905698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964399A1] This invention relates to compounds of formula (I) or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof, which are inhibitors of cysteine proteases, particularly cathepsin K, and are useful in the treatment of diseases in which inhibition of bone loss is a factor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 215/14; C07D 207/12; C07D 261/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/4709 (2006.01); A61P 1/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 207/12 (2006.01); C07D 207/24 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 413/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07D 207/24 (2013.01); C07D 413/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964399 A1 19991216; AR 018652 A1 20011128; AU 4564499 A 19991230; CA 2334652 A1 19991216; CO 5040090 A1 20010529; DZ 2815 A1 20031201; EP 1086083 A1 20010328; EP 1086083 A4 20010926; JP 2002517485 A 20020618; MA 24877 A1 19991231; PE 07252000 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040312

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2001-09-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07D 215/14 A, 7C 07D 261/08 B, 7C 07D 207/12 B, 7C 07D 207/24 B, 7C 07D 401/12 B, 7C 07D 413/14 B, 7A 61K 31/40 B

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001108

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL